THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:59:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Road
HBKR
GUaG / ENS
Room 2E107
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167293583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sefi Kronenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kronenberg (CPSO#: 102307 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654 Extn: 201122

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Road
HBKR
GUaG / ENS
Room 2E107
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167293583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sefi Kronenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kronenberg (CPSO#: 102307 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654 Extn: 201122

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEFI KRONENBERG may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEFI KRONENBERG may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2013