THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:23:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Care Group
St Josephs Hospital
Box 3251
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-346-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter de Bakker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. de Bakker (CPSO#: 102315 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
St Joseph's Care Group
Box 3251
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-2310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Care Group
St Josephs Hospital
Box 3251
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-346-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter de Bakker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. de Bakker (CPSO#: 102315 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
St Joseph's Care Group
Box 3251
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-2310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL DE BAKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BAKKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL DE BAKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BAKKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013