THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Huron Street
Ground Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 305-3311
Fax: (226) 633-5800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chueng Chen Chuan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chueng Chen Chuan (CPSO#: 102322 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210
Business Address: 150 Huron Street
Ground Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
(519) 305-3311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Huron Street
Ground Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 305-3311
Fax: (226) 633-5800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chueng Chen Chuan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chueng Chen Chuan (CPSO#: 102322 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210
Business Address: 150 Huron Street
Ground Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
(519) 305-3311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTELLE MEE FAH CHUENG CHEN CHUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUENG CHEN CHUAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTELLE MEE FAH CHUENG CHEN CHUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUENG CHEN CHUAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2013