THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:56:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 32362
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr.
Brampton Ontario L6R3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Nov 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 102325 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 32362
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr.
Brampton Ontario L6R3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Nov 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 102325 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rishi Kumar may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rishi Kumar may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2013