THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Paris, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
Critical Care Department
Room 4-08
209 Victoria St, Toronto,
Toronto Ontario M5B 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 5686
Fax: (416) 864-5698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laurent Brochard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Brochard (CPSO#: 102344 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Critical Care Department
Room 4079
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 6214

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Paris, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
Critical Care Department
Room 4-08
209 Victoria St, Toronto,
Toronto Ontario M5B 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 5686
Fax: (416) 864-5698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laurent Brochard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Brochard (CPSO#: 102344 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Critical Care Department
Room 4079
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 6214

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Apr 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 04 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Laurent Jean Brochard may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Brochard holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the rquirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Brochard
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Laurent Jean Brochard may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Brochard holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the rquirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Brochard
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Paris, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014