THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:14:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6884
Fax: (905) 721-6690

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 102347 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J0C7
(905) 721-6884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6884
Fax: (905) 721-6690

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 102347 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J0C7
(905) 721-6884

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2013