THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saliba Family Medicine
155 Highway 20 West
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-0008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Saliba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saliba (CPSO#: 102353 )
Business Address: 155 Hwy 20 W
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saliba Family Medicine
155 Highway 20 West
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-0008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Saliba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saliba (CPSO#: 102353 )
Business Address: 155 Hwy 20 W
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Oct 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 19 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tony Henry Saliba may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tony Henry Saliba may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2013