THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1919 Riverside Drive
201
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-695-6000
Fax: 613-695-2468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramin Yazdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yazdani (CPSO#: 102356 )
Business Address: Suite 401
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
(613) 695-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1919 Riverside Drive
201
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-695-6000
Fax: 613-695-2468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramin Yazdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yazdani (CPSO#: 102356 )
Business Address: Suite 401
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
(613) 695-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMIN YAZDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMIN YAZDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2013