THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:24:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Center
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137377350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Mushtaq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mushtaq (CPSO#: 102373 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
6134324851

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Center
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137377350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Mushtaq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mushtaq (CPSO#: 102373 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
6134324851

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 May 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 08 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheeba Mushtaq may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheeba Mushtaq may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2013