THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shelburne Centre For Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 925-0017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
HOSPITAL
SURGERY
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Robert St
Shelburne, ON L0N 1S1
Shelburne Ontario L9V2S5
Phone: (519) 925-3746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tristan Sumabat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sumabat (CPSO#: 102383 )
Business Address: Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
(519) 925-0017
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shelburne Centre For Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 925-0017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
HOSPITAL
SURGERY
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Robert St
Shelburne, ON L0N 1S1
Shelburne Ontario L9V2S5
Phone: (519) 925-3746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tristan Sumabat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sumabat (CPSO#: 102383 )
Business Address: Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
(519) 925-0017
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tristan Jordan Sumabat may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tristan Jordan Sumabat may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2013