THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Misiway Community Health Centre
130 Wilson Ave
Timmins Ontario p4n 2s9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Monteith Correctional Complex
3052 Rese Rd
Monteith ON P0K 1P0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louisa Marion-Bellemare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marion-Bellemare (CPSO#: 102390 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 3052 Rese Road
3052 Reese Road
Iroquois Falls Ontario P0K 1P0
Business Address: Misiway Community Health Centre
130 Wilson Ave
Timmins ON P4N 2S9
705-264-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Misiway Community Health Centre
130 Wilson Ave
Timmins Ontario p4n 2s9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Monteith Correctional Complex
3052 Rese Rd
Monteith ON P0K 1P0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louisa Marion-Bellemare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marion-Bellemare (CPSO#: 102390 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 3052 Rese Road
3052 Reese Road
Iroquois Falls Ontario P0K 1P0
Business Address: Misiway Community Health Centre
130 Wilson Ave
Timmins ON P4N 2S9
705-264-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISA PATRICIA MARION-BELLEMARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARION-BELLEMARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISA PATRICIA MARION-BELLEMARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARION-BELLEMARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014