THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:42:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay Street
Unit 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3000-181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Weste Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weste (CPSO#: 102397 )
Business Address: 2255B Queen St E
Suite 356
Toronto ON M4E 1G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay Street
Unit 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3000-181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Weste Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weste (CPSO#: 102397 )
Business Address: 2255B Queen St E
Suite 356
Toronto ON M4E 1G3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Jan 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 28 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Erica Sharone Weste may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Erica Sharone Weste may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2014