THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade de Santa Maria, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juglans Souto Alvarez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Souto Alvarez (CPSO#: 102406 )
Business Address: 585 University Ave
9089F-9MaRS
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
4163404800 Extn: 5133

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade de Santa Maria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juglans Souto Alvarez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Souto Alvarez (CPSO#: 102406 )
Business Address: 585 University Ave
9089F-9MaRS
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
4163404800 Extn: 5133

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de Santa Maria, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014