THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PRHC
1 Hospital Dr, Peterborough, ON
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W.
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-270 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 876-4511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 25 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 102409 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Urology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario M5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 101 - 380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 743-6480
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PRHC
1 Hospital Dr, Peterborough, ON
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W.
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-270 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 876-4511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 25 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 102409 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Urology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario M5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 101 - 380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 743-6480
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED JACOB HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED JACOB HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2013