THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:01:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
12 E-252
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416-340-5223
Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Phone: 416-847-8940
Fax: 416-646-5109
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Diabetic Kidney Disease Clinic
Tower 5, Room 5.107
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 86499
Fax: 647-798-3798

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CALVIN KE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ke (CPSO#: 102429 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
12 E-252
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-3298

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
12 E-252
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416-340-5223
Address: 300 Silver Star Blvd
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON M1V 0G2
Phone: 416-847-8940
Fax: 416-646-5109
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Diabetic Kidney Disease Clinic
Tower 5, Room 5.107
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 86499
Fax: 647-798-3798

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CALVIN KE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ke (CPSO#: 102429 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
12 E-252
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-3298

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN HERMAN KE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN HERMAN KE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014