THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:11:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
Neuromuscular Division
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3966
Fax: 416-340-3297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAMID SADEGHIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sadeghian (CPSO#: 102433 )
Business Address: TORONTO WESTERN HOSPITAL
NEUROPHYSIOLOGY LAB
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-303-5800 Extn: 2060
Business Address: TORONTO GENERAL HOSPITAL
UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK
200 Elizabeth Street
5E-334
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-3966

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
Neuromuscular Division
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3966
Fax: 416-340-3297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAMID SADEGHIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sadeghian (CPSO#: 102433 )
Business Address: TORONTO WESTERN HOSPITAL
NEUROPHYSIOLOGY LAB
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-303-5800 Extn: 2060
Business Address: TORONTO GENERAL HOSPITAL
UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK
200 Elizabeth Street
5E-334
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-3966

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID SADEGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEGHIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID SADEGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEGHIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2013