THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058925777
Fax: 9058927539
Address: 29 St. Helena St
St. Catharines ON L2N 3Z9
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 473 Vine St
St. Catharines ON L2M 3S9
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 180 Lakeshore Rd
St. Catharines ON L2N 2V3
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saquib Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ansari (CPSO#: 102471 )
Business Address: 3-209 Hwy 20 E
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E6
(905) 892-5777
Business Address: 277 Plymouth Road
Welland Ontario L3B 6E3
(905) 714-7428
Business Address: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
905 892 5777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058925777
Fax: 9058927539
Address: 29 St. Helena St
St. Catharines ON L2N 3Z9
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 473 Vine St
St. Catharines ON L2M 3S9
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 180 Lakeshore Rd
St. Catharines ON L2N 2V3
Phone: 289 362 2521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saquib Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ansari (CPSO#: 102471 )
Business Address: 3-209 Hwy 20 E
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E6
(905) 892-5777
Business Address: 277 Plymouth Road
Welland Ontario L3B 6E3
(905) 714-7428
Business Address: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
905 892 5777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAQUIB ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAQUIB ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2014