THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Andhra University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-6981 Millcreek Dr
Millcreek Children's Clinic and Breastfeeding Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 286-0090
Fax: (905) 567-0030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A M Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 102481 )
Business Address: 6-6981 Millcreek Dr
Millcreek Children's Clinic and Breastfeeding Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
(905) 286-0090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU
Medical School: Andhra University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-6981 Millcreek Dr
Millcreek Children's Clinic and Breastfeeding Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 286-0090
Fax: (905) 567-0030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A M Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 102481 )
Business Address: 6-6981 Millcreek Dr
Millcreek Children's Clinic and Breastfeeding Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
(905) 286-0090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABU MOHAMMED ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABU MOHAMMED ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Andhra University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2014