THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:16:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare Pediatrics
301 - 491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Hosptial
Pediatric Gastroenterology
4th floor Pediatrics Clinic
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Extension: 21400
Fax: 416-242-1095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Zaretsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaretsky (CPSO#: 102504 )
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare Pediatrics
301 - 491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Hosptial
Pediatric Gastroenterology
4th floor Pediatrics Clinic
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Extension: 21400
Fax: 416-242-1095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Zaretsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaretsky (CPSO#: 102504 )
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK EDWARD ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK EDWARD ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014