THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 1256
Fax: 7056715457
Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: 7056755900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 127 Cedar St
Sudbury ON P3E 1B1
Phone: 7055234988
Fax: 7056691509
Address: 100-330 Second Ave
Timmins ON P4N 8A4
Phone: 7052678100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: 7052882615
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bosah Nwosu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nwosu (CPSO#: 102548 )
Business Address: 935 Woodlawn Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 6J6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 1256
Fax: 7056715457
Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: 7056755900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 127 Cedar St
Sudbury ON P3E 1B1
Phone: 7055234988
Fax: 7056691509
Address: 100-330 Second Ave
Timmins ON P4N 8A4
Phone: 7052678100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: 7052882615
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bosah Nwosu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nwosu (CPSO#: 102548 )
Business Address: 935 Woodlawn Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 6J6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOSAH CELESTINE NWOSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWOSU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOSAH CELESTINE NWOSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWOSU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2014