THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
Centenary 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3415
Fax: (613) 545-2202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Asai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Asai (CPSO#: 102554 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
166 Brock Street
Centenary 3-27
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
Centenary 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3415
Fax: (613) 545-2202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Asai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Asai (CPSO#: 102554 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Dermatology
166 Brock Street
Centenary 3-27
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUKA ASAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUKA ASAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2014