THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa
K1Z7K4
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7226521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Precision Medical Centre
104-613, Longfields Dr.
Barrhaven, Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6J2
Phone: 6134407762
Fax: 6134408762

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olabisi Owoeye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Owoeye (CPSO#: 102557 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: Precision Medical Centre
104 - 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6J2
(613) 440-7762

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa
K1Z7K4
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7226521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Precision Medical Centre
104-613, Longfields Dr.
Barrhaven, Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6J2
Phone: 6134407762
Fax: 6134408762

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olabisi Owoeye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Owoeye (CPSO#: 102557 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: Precision Medical Centre
104 - 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6J2
(613) 440-7762

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Dec 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 20 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Olabisi Idowu Owoeye may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Olabisi Idowu Owoeye may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2014