THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199718874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 13 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vallari Majmudar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Majmudar (CPSO#: 102567 )
Business Address: 2074 Grand Ravine Dr
Oakville ON L6H 6B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199718874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 13 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vallari Majmudar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Majmudar (CPSO#: 102567 )
Business Address: 2074 Grand Ravine Dr
Oakville ON L6H 6B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALLARI MAJMUDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJMUDAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALLARI MAJMUDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJMUDAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2014