THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:33:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3790
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 07 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Pakkal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pakkal (CPSO#: 102588 )
Business Address: UHN
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: UHN
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 3790
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: UHN
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-2581
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Pune, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3790
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 07 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Pakkal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pakkal (CPSO#: 102588 )
Business Address: UHN
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: UHN
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 3790
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: UHN
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-2581
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 07 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MINI VITHAL PAKKAL may practise medicine independently in cardiothoracic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MINI VITHAL PAKKAL may practise medicine independently in cardiothoracic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2014