THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Milan, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165863195
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Phone: 416 586 3195
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Oct 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronzoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ronzoni (CPSO#: 102631 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
M4-140 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 3M5
(416) 480-2591

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Milan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165863195
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Phone: 416 586 3195
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Oct 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronzoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ronzoni (CPSO#: 102631 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
M4-140 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 3M5
(416) 480-2591

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Oct 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 04 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Stefania Nicoletta Ronzoni may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Ronzoni holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Ronzoni no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Stefania Nicoletta Ronzoni may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Ronzoni holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Ronzoni no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Milan, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2014