THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 22:28:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-169 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-216-0663
Fax: 9052162865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Swan (CPSO#: 102648 )
Business Address: 9671 Jane Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3X5
(905) 417-9672
Business Address: 355 Wellington Street
London Ontario N6A 3N7
(519) 432-1919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-169 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-216-0663
Fax: 9052162865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Swan (CPSO#: 102648 )
Business Address: 9671 Jane Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3X5
(905) 417-9672
Business Address: 355 Wellington Street
London Ontario N6A 3N7
(519) 432-1919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ELIZABETH SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ELIZABETH SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2014