THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:31:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rexdale Medical Centre
Unit #2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. K. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak (CPSO#: 102650 )
Business Address: Rexdale Medical Centre
Suite 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rexdale Medical Centre
Unit #2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. K. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak (CPSO#: 102650 )
Business Address: Rexdale Medical Centre
Suite 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KEENAN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KEENAN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2014