THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Hill Medical Centre
Unit 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052378628
Fax: 9052378618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siu Hung Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 102652 )
Business Address: 20 - 1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M2
(905) 237-8628

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Hill Medical Centre
Unit 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052378628
Fax: 9052378618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siu Hung Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 102652 )
Business Address: 20 - 1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M2
(905) 237-8628

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIU HUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIU HUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014