THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:02:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 944-1118
Fax: 519944-5415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Satz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Satz (CPSO#: 102662 )
Business Address: 7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
5199441118

Corporation Name: Stephanie Satz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 944-1118
Fax: 519944-5415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Satz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Satz (CPSO#: 102662 )
Business Address: 7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor Ontario N8S 1E1
5199441118

Corporation Name: Stephanie Satz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Feb 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 12 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Stephanie L. Satz may practise medicine independently in family medicine
and emergency medicine.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Stephanie L. Satz may practise medicine independently in family medicine
and emergency medicine.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2014