THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:38:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-579 Kerr St
Oakville ON L6K 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058424441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 King's Cross Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 3V5
Phone: 9057999144
Fax: 9057992267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abu-Almaali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Augla (CPSO#: 102672 ) Dr. A. Abu-Almaali (CPSO#: 102673 )
Business Address: 579 Kerr Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3E1
(905) 842-4441
Business Address: 969 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8T 4V9
(289) 755-3296
Business Address: 1962 Rymal Road East
Hannon Ontario L0R 1P0
(905) 692-6060

Corporation Name: Augla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Augla (CPSO#: 102672 )
Business Address: 7 - 579 Kerr Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3E1
(905) 842-4441
Business Address: 17 King's Cross Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 3V5
(905) 799-9144

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-579 Kerr St
Oakville ON L6K 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058424441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 King's Cross Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 3V5
Phone: 9057999144
Fax: 9057992267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abu-Almaali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Augla (CPSO#: 102672 ) Dr. A. Abu-Almaali (CPSO#: 102673 )
Business Address: 579 Kerr Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3E1
(905) 842-4441
Business Address: 969 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8T 4V9
(289) 755-3296
Business Address: 1962 Rymal Road East
Hannon Ontario L0R 1P0
(905) 692-6060

Corporation Name: Augla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Augla (CPSO#: 102672 )
Business Address: 7 - 579 Kerr Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3E1
(905) 842-4441
Business Address: 17 King's Cross Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 3V5
(905) 799-9144

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN HENDI AUGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN HENDI AUGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2014