THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital Saint-Vincent
60, rue Cambridge St. N
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1R7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: 613-782-2785
Address: Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: No Information Available
Extension: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHARLES W. KOWALSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kowalski (CPSO#: 102675 )
Business Address: 2390 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-6133 Extn: 774

Corporation Name: Charles W. Kowalski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital Saint-Vincent
60, rue Cambridge St. N
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1R7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: 613-782-2785
Address: Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: No Information Available
Extension: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHARLES W. KOWALSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kowalski (CPSO#: 102675 )
Business Address: 2390 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-6133 Extn: 774

Corporation Name: Charles W. Kowalski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM KOWALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWALSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM KOWALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWALSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2014