THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:27:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-737-2450
Fax: 705-737-4250
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARYSE LAVOIE MÉDECINE SOCIÉTÉ PROFESSIONNELLE
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lavoie (CPSO#: 102726 )
Business Address: 116 Clapperton St
Barrie ON L4M 3G4
Business Address: 82 Brighton Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6S3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-737-2450
Fax: 705-737-4250
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARYSE LAVOIE MÉDECINE SOCIÉTÉ PROFESSIONNELLE
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lavoie (CPSO#: 102726 )
Business Address: 116 Clapperton St
Barrie ON L4M 3G4
Business Address: 82 Brighton Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6S3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE CELINE LAVOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVOIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE CELINE LAVOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVOIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2014