THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Coronation Family Physicians
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punam Rawal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rawal (CPSO#: 102733 )
Business Address: 180 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 7H8
Business Address: 202-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 639-3666
Business Address: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Coronation Family Physicians
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punam Rawal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rawal (CPSO#: 102733 )
Business Address: 180 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 7H8
Business Address: 202-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 639-3666
Business Address: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNAM RAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNAM RAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2014