THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 360-700 Lawrence Ave W
TIDHI
North York ON M6A 3B4
Phone: 647 812 2113
Fax: 647 812 2114
Address: Suit 103
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 767-8289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Apr 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Greece

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petros Zezos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zezos (CPSO#: 102738 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Scienes Centre
Department of Internal Medicine/Gastroenterology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 103 - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 767-7211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 360-700 Lawrence Ave W
TIDHI
North York ON M6A 3B4
Phone: 647 812 2113
Fax: 647 812 2114
Address: Suit 103
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 767-8289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Apr 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Greece

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petros Zezos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zezos (CPSO#: 102738 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Scienes Centre
Department of Internal Medicine/Gastroenterology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 103 - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 767-7211

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PETROS ZEZOS may practise medicine independently in gastroenterology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PETROS ZEZOS may practise medicine independently in gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014