THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:13:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of California, Los Angeles, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2979 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-0560
Fax: (905) 595-0562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Rhode Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bahl (CPSO#: 102756 )
Business Address: 5-1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 763-8660
Business Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
(905) 595-0560

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Univ of California, Los Angeles, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2979 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-0560
Fax: (905) 595-0562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Rhode Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bahl (CPSO#: 102756 )
Business Address: 5-1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 763-8660
Business Address: 2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C6
(905) 595-0560

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Aug 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 04 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nupur Bahl may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nupur Bahl may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of California, Los Angeles, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014