THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:01:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 Leslie St
Private Practice
Thoracic surgery
Suite 116
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-967-9798
Fax: 905-967-9788
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kavanagh (CPSO#: 102773 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Doris Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: York Thoracic Surgery
56 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 853-5864

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 Leslie St
Private Practice
Thoracic surgery
Suite 116
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-967-9798
Fax: 905-967-9788
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kavanagh (CPSO#: 102773 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Doris Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: York Thoracic Surgery
56 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 853-5864

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Oct 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 29 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CRYSTAL MARGUERITE KAVANAGH may practise medicine independently in general surgery and thoracic surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CRYSTAL MARGUERITE KAVANAGH may practise medicine independently in general surgery and thoracic surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2014