THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 219-3555
Fax: (519) 219-3888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnamurti Munoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Munoz (CPSO#: 102789 )
Business Address: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
(519) 219-3555
Business Address: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 219-3555
Fax: (519) 219-3888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnamurti Munoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Munoz (CPSO#: 102789 )
Business Address: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
(519) 219-3555
Business Address: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNAMURTI MUNOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNOZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNAMURTI MUNOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNOZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2014