THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Howard University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
545 Steeles Avenue West Unit 1A
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pinto (CPSO#: 102798 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
545 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 1A
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
(647) 722-2370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Howard University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
545 Steeles Avenue West Unit 1A
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pinto (CPSO#: 102798 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
545 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 1A
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
(647) 722-2370

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Dec 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 17 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Martin Masajja Pinto may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Martin Masajja Pinto may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Howard University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2014