THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton Ontario N0G 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 638-3088
Fax: (519) 638-3982
Address: Palmerston and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
P.O. Box 130
500 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Phone: (519) 343-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Deacon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Deacon (CPSO#: 102840 )
Business Address: Palmerston and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
500 Whites Road
PO Box 130
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-2030
Business Address: Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton Ontario N0G 1P0
(519) 638-3088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton Ontario N0G 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 638-3088
Fax: (519) 638-3982
Address: Palmerston and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
P.O. Box 130
500 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Phone: (519) 343-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Deacon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Deacon (CPSO#: 102840 )
Business Address: Palmerston and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
500 Whites Road
PO Box 130
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-2030
Business Address: Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton Ontario N0G 1P0
(519) 638-3088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP MICHAEL DEACON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEACON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP MICHAEL DEACON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEACON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2014