THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:05:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cornell University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Div of Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taslim Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dawood (CPSO#: 102862 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffille Hospital
Division of Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cornell University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Div of Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taslim Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dawood (CPSO#: 102862 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffille Hospital
Division of Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7013

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Apr 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 22 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Taslim Allibhai Dawood may practise medicine independently in paediatrics
and neonatology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Taslim Allibhai Dawood may practise medicine independently in paediatrics
and neonatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cornell University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2014