THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:44:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus Family Health Team
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Maternity & Newborn Care
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Trickovic & Dr. V. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Swan (CPSO#: 102886 ) Dr. J. Trickovic (CPSO#: 119637 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555
Business Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL
CIVIC CAMPUS FAMILY HEALTH TEAM
210 Melrose Ave S
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
613-761-4334

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus Family Health Team
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Maternity & Newborn Care
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Trickovic & Dr. V. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Swan (CPSO#: 102886 ) Dr. J. Trickovic (CPSO#: 119637 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555
Business Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL
CIVIC CAMPUS FAMILY HEALTH TEAM
210 Melrose Ave S
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
613-761-4334

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA JESSIE DOWSE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA JESSIE DOWSE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2014