THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 City Centre Drive
Suite 420
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-4482
Fax: 905-828-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Tom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tom (CPSO#: 102888 )
Business Address: 33 City Centre Dr
Suite 420
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5
9058284482

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 City Centre Drive
Suite 420
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-4482
Fax: 905-828-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Tom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tom (CPSO#: 102888 )
Business Address: 33 City Centre Dr
Suite 420
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5
9058284482

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE TOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE TOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014