THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-481 John St
Burlington ON L7R 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-9636
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Sheppard Ave W
Unit 3
North York ON M3H 2T7
Phone: (416) 613-8730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue West
Unit 3
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T7
Phone: (416) 613-8730
Fax: (416) 764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reza Ahmadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahmadzadeh (CPSO#: 102896 )
Business Address: 200-481 John St
Burlington ON L7R 2K8
(905) 336-9636

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-481 John St
Burlington ON L7R 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-9636
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Sheppard Ave W
Unit 3
North York ON M3H 2T7
Phone: (416) 613-8730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue West
Unit 3
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T7
Phone: (416) 613-8730
Fax: (416) 764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reza Ahmadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahmadzadeh (CPSO#: 102896 )
Business Address: 200-481 John St
Burlington ON L7R 2K8
(905) 336-9636

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REZA AHMADZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMADZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REZA AHMADZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMADZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014