THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:24:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Novi Sad, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Surgery
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2128
Fax: (613) 548-2500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Dec 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mila Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kolar (CPSO#: 102917 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Novi Sad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Surgery
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2128
Fax: (613) 548-2500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Dec 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mila Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kolar (CPSO#: 102917 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jun 2020
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 15 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Mila Kolar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General Surgery, Queen's University, in which Dr. Kolar
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Kolar no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on December 18, 2019, and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Kolar's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Mila Kolar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General Surgery, Queen's University, in which Dr. Kolar
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Kolar no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on December 18, 2019, and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Kolar's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Novi Sad, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014