THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:56:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aidan Cunniffe and Geetika Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cunniffe (CPSO#: 102918 ) Dr. G. Verma (CPSO#: 76377 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 201-26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aidan Cunniffe and Geetika Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cunniffe (CPSO#: 102918 ) Dr. G. Verma (CPSO#: 76377 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 201-26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDAN MAGNUS CUNNIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNIFFE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDAN MAGNUS CUNNIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNIFFE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2014