THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:58:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Geriatrics Assessment Program
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 53013
Fax: (905) 358-4972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziyaad Al-Khateeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Al-Khateeb (CPSO#: 102922 )
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 358-4944
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Geriatrics Assessment Program
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 53013
Fax: (905) 358-4972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziyaad Al-Khateeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Al-Khateeb (CPSO#: 102922 )
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 358-4944
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIYAAD AL-KHATEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KHATEEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIYAAD AL-KHATEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KHATEEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014