THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:11:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
New Best Care Medical Centre
Unit 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 8686
Fax: 905 848 8796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SIMON LANDMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Landman (CPSO#: 102930 )
Business Address: 214-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9058486079

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
New Best Care Medical Centre
Unit 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 8686
Fax: 905 848 8796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SIMON LANDMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Landman (CPSO#: 102930 )
Business Address: 214-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9058486079

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON THOMAS ANDREW LANDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON THOMAS ANDREW LANDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014