THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Morningside Ave
suite 14,15
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473523621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-2860 Denison St
Markham ON L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0433
Fax: 905-554-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sammena Sara Imran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Imran (CPSO#: 102936 )
Business Address: 1145 Morningside Avenue
Suite 14 & 15
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Morningside Ave
suite 14,15
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473523621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-2860 Denison St
Markham ON L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0433
Fax: 905-554-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sammena Sara Imran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Imran (CPSO#: 102936 )
Business Address: 1145 Morningside Avenue
Suite 14 & 15
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMMENA SARA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMMENA SARA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014