THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:52:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lennox & Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Roche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Roche (CPSO#: 102942 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: L&A County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: 101-200 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview Ontario K7N 0B6
(613) 507-0213

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lennox & Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Roche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Roche (CPSO#: 102942 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: L&A County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: 101-200 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview Ontario K7N 0B6
(613) 507-0213

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014