THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (437) 524-6269
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: 5198423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (437) 524-6269
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: 5198423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PING YU XIONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PING YU XIONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014